CA AB24 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5374 of, and to add Section 5444 to, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 1808.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network companies: public safety requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2015-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code5374Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5444New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code1808.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback