CA AB2395 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 711 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: replacement of public switched telephone network.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-05-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission.
2016-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 13).
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2016-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code372Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code711New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback