CA AB2393 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44977.5 of, and to add Sections 45196.1, 87780.1, and 88196.1 to, the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: sick leave: parental leave.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2393 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2393 Campos By Liu (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2393 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2393 Campos By Liu (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2393 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6281.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5254.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5138.) Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 4856.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 4). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44977.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45196.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 87780.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 88196.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |