CA AB239 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to school financing.
Title
School financing: common core implementation: broadband network.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26230 | New Code | See Bill Text |