CA AB239 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11062 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Crime laboratories: oversight.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 239 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB239 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 239 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB239 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 239 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3069.). | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2346.). | |
2011-08-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1645.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2011-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |