CA AB2389 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 18 (commencing with Section 3273) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to contractor disclosure requirements.
Title
Contractor disclosure requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2389 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2389 Bonnie Lowenthal By Hernandez (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2389 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2389 Bonnie Lowenthal By Hernandez (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2389 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6417.). | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4759.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 4926.) | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). | |
2012-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3273 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 51.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |