CA AB2388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12509, 12509.5, 12660, and 12814.6 of, and to add Section 11103.5 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Driver’s licenses: instruction permits and provisional licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12509 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12509.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12814.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |