CA AB2380 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 882, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 882, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 993 to the Penal Code, relating to defendants.
Title
Defendants: minor children.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2380 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2380 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2380 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2380 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2380 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 882, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6044.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4989.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4772.) |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4393.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1559.200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 993 | New Code | See Bill Text |