CA AB2374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 99350) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: Free Speech on Campus Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code99350New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback