CA AB2374 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6971 and 6972 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Construction Manager/General Contractor method: regional transportation agency: County of Placer: bridges.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2374 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2374 Chiu By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 2374 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2374 Chiu By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 2374 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6294.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5224.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4262.) |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 6971 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 6972 | Amended Code | Citation Text |