CA AB2373 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22.5 to the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 22.5 to the Civil Code, to add Section 32.7 to the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 3405 of the Commercial Code, to add Section 22 to the Corporations Code, to add Section 91 to the Education Code, to add Section 23 to the Financial Code, to add Section 34 to the Food and Agricultural Code, to add Section 27 to the Government Code, to add Section 26 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, to add Section 29 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 49 to the Insurance Code, to add Section 30 to, and to repeal Section 3353 of, the Labor Code, to amend Section 395.10 of the Military and Veterans Code, to add Section 7.2 to the Penal Code, to add Section 1102.5 to the Public Contract Code, to amend Section 6217.1 of the Public Resources Code, to add Section 20.2 to the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 23.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to add Section 17.5 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, to add Section 364 to the Vehicle Code, to add Section 27 to the Water Code, and to add Section 28 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to independent contractors.
Title
Independent contractor: definition.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Norby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2373&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2373_bill_20120224_introduced.html |