CA AB2372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 915, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65917.2 to the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: density bonus: floor area ratio bonus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2372 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2372 Gloria et al. By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2372 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 915, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6804.).
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5456.).
2018-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5209.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65917.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback