CA AB2371 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 7065.06 and 7195.5 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 65592, 65596, and 65596.5 of, and to add Section 65596.7 to, the Government Code, relating to water use efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water use efficiency: landscape irrigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2371 CARRILLO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2371 Carrillo et al. By Glazer (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2371 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 6852.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 5762.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and N.R. & W.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5651.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 10).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and A. & A.R.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7065.06New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7195.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code53314New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code53333New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code53391Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code53481Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code53482Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code53482.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code53483Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code83483Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11011.29Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11011.30New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11011.31New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11011.32New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65592Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65596Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65596.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65596.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code10609New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code10960New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback