CA AB2371 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.9 of the Penal Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: criminal defendants: mental health issues and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2371 BUTLER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2371 Butler By Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2371 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2371 Butler By Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2371 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 6439.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4691.). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 19. Page 4988.) | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 17). | |
2012-04-10 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |