CA AB2370 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1596.866 and 1596.8661 of, and to add Sections 1596.7996 and 1597.16 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to lead exposure.
Title
Lead exposure: child day care facilities: family day care homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2370 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2370 Holden et al. By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2370 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2370 Holden et al. By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2370 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 7000.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5955.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and HUMAN S. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8278.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116278 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.7996 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.866 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.8661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1597.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |