CA AB237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1016, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22365, 22370, 22371, 22379, and 22380 of the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pilot Program for Increased Access to Responsible Small Dollar Loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 237 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB237 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 237 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1016, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2018-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-30Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.)
2018-08-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 6959.)
2018-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.)
2018-08-30Assembly(Com. on B. & F.)
2018-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.)
2018-08-29AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5942.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-18SenateMeasure version as amended on July 3 corrected.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2018-06-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-07-03SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2017-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback