CA AB2364 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1030, 1032, 1256, 1329, 1329.1, 1537, and 3011 of, and to repeal Division 5 (commencing with Section 12100) of, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment insurance: benefits: good cause to leave
Sponsors
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2364 NAVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2364 Nava By DeSaulnier (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2364 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2364 Nava By DeSaulnier (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2364 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6585.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4771.) | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 2). | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.) | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |
2010-03-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |