CA AB236 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12701 and 12703.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to weighmasters.
Title
Weighmasters: exemptions: pawnbrokers and secondhand dealers.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB236 Lackey (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 236 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 236 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1755.). |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 12703.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |