CA AB2356 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1644.5 of, and to add Section 1644.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to human tissue.
Title
Tissue donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2356 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2356 Skinner By Leno (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2356 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2356 Skinner By Leno (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2356 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 6563.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4906.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-31 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5203.) | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5138.) | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 1). | |
2012-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1644.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1644.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |