CA AB2353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 916.5 to the Civil Code, relating to construction defects.
Title
Construction defects: actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2353 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2353 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5301.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 916.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |