CA AB2352 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10002 of, and to add Sections 15506 and 17507 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: reportable events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2352 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2352 Low By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2352 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6869.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5823.).
2018-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5418.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code10002Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code15506New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code17507New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback