CA AB2352 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 76001 and 76002 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: early and middle college high schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2352 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2352 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5189.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 76002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |