CA AB2352 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11155, 11155.1, and 11257 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs eligibility: asset limits: vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2352 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2352 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4882.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11155.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |