CA AB2351 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51283 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Williamson Act: cancellation: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2351 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2351 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-28 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 4881.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-17 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-10 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |