CA AB235 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12814.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver's licenses.
Title
Driver's licenses: provisional licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 235 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 235 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1705.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12814.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |