CA AB2349 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14502 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Section 22295 of the Penal Code, relating to humane officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humane officers: authorization to carry a wooden club or baton.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2349 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2349 CHEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-01 Approved by the Governor.
2018-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.).
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4532.)
2018-03-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code14502Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code22295Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback