CA AB2347 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 786, 10127.9, 10127.10, 10127.13, and 10509.6 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - AB 2347 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2347 Gonzalez By Torres (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2347 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2347 Gonzalez By Torres (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2347 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5805.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4192.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4968.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10127.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10127.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10127.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10509.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |