CA AB2347 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 2924f of the Civil Code, relating to mortgage defaults.
Title
Mortgage defaults: secondary public financing.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2347 FEUER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2347 Feuer By Padilla (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2347 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2347 Feuer By Padilla (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2347 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6584.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4796.) | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5423.) | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5338.). | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 3). | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 27). | |
2010-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |