CA AB2346 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 454.85 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: rates: wildfire expense memorandum accounts.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2346 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2346 Quirk By Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2346 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2346 Quirk By Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2346 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5821.). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5437.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |