CA AB2345 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.002 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.2 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: preventive services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2345 DE LA TORRE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2345 De La Torre By Florez (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2345 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2345 De La Torre By Florez (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2345 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6583.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4803.) | |
2010-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 5484.) | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |