CA AB2344 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 964, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 964, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.8 (commencing with Section 158) to Chapter 1 of Division 1 of, and to repeal Section 158.5 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Wildlife connectivity: transportation projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2344 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2344 Friedman et al. By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2344 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2344 Friedman et al. By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2344 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 964, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 9.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5207.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 7. Page 4991.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and TRANS. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 158 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 158.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |