CA AB2343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1161 and 1167 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property: possession: unlawful detainer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2343 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2343 Chiu By Allen (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2343 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6499.).
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5438.).
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3).
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 5664.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.)
2018-05-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback