CA AB2343 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39720 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |