CA AB2339 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65583 and 65863 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Housing element: emergency shelters: regional housing need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2339 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2339 Bloom By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2339 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2339 Bloom By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2339 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 5217.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 4923.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |