CA AB2339 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Net energy metering.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 13). |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |