CA AB2339 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11167 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse reporting.
Title
Child abuse reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Special Consent #28 AB2339 Smyth (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2339 SMYTH Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2339 SMYTH Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-07-06 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2010-06-28 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-06-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4100.) | |
2010-06-23 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). | |
2010-06-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4818.) | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 13). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |