CA AB2333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 8587.14 and 8587.15 to the Government Code, relating to behavioral health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Emergency Services: behavioral health response.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2333 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5417.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8587.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8587.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8587.15New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback