CA AB2329 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9031, 13857, and 32103 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 5536 and 5784.15 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 22407 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to special districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special districts: board of directors: compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2329 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2329 Obernolte By Morrell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2329 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6140.).
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5107.).
2018-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5250.)
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback