CA AB2325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5600.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services.
Title
County mental health services: veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2325 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2325 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2325 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5041.). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5004.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5600.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |