CA AB2324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15630 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elder or dependent adult abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elder or dependent adult abuse: disorderly conduct: mandated reporters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback