CA AB2322 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1808.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Motor Vehicles: records: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2322 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2322 Daly By Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2322 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6370.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5271.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-28SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4645.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1808.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback