CA AB2321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 781 and 786 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juvenile court records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court records: access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2321 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2321 Jones-Sawyer By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2321 Jones-Sawyer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5340.).
2020-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4353.).
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-19SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4727.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19).
2020-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code781Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code786Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback