CA AB232 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 38010 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Off-highway vehicles: reciprocity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB232 Gallagher et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 232 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2021-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code38010Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback