CA AB2319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30, 19325.1, 33126, 33195.4, 33533, 44256, 44257, 44610, 44611, 44615, 44616, 44856, 48223, 51212, 51220, 51225.3, 51243, 51244, 51245, 51460, 51461, 51865, 52167, 60119, 60603, 60605.3, and 66081 of, and to add Section 91 to, the Education Code, relating to foreign language education.
Title
Foreign language education: world language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2319 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2319 Nazarian By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2319 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2319 Nazarian By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2319 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6890.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5889.). |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4645.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |