CA AB2313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 712, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10072 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic benefits transfer system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2313 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2313 Mark Stone By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2313 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 712, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5781.).
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4645.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10072Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback