CA AB2312 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17201.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deduction: qualified education loans.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17201.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |