CA AB2312 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17059.4 and 23690 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23690 | New Code | See Bill Text |