CA AB231 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003 of the Penal Code, relating to postconviction supervised release.
Title
Parole: placement at release.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 231 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB231 Eggman By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 231 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB231 Eggman By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 231 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2866.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2396.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1222.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2015-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |