CA AB2308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 8.55 (commencing with Section 22965) to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cigarettes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarettes: single-use filters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2018-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22965New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback