CA AB2304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.5 (commencing with Section 485) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
California Water Market Clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 485 | New Code | See Bill Text |